US SB3267 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide adequate information about excessive Federal spending, and for other purposes.
Title
MAKE CENTS Act Making Americans Know about Excessive spending through Commonsense Efforts to Notice and Target Shenanigans Act
Sponsors
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB129 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB4559 (Related) 2019-09-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SB186 (Related) 2019-01-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB807 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB1238 (Related) 2019-04-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB4559 (Related) 2019-09-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SB186 (Related) 2019-01-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB807 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB1238 (Related) 2019-04-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget process
Congressional operations and organization
Congressional oversight
Economics and public finance
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Inflation and prices
Legislative rules and procedure
Members of Congress
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Senate
State and local government operations
Transportation costs
Budget process
Congressional operations and organization
Congressional oversight
Economics and public finance
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Inflation and prices
Legislative rules and procedure
Members of Congress
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Senate
State and local government operations
Transportation costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3267/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3267/BILLS-116s3267is.pdf |