US SB3227 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to designate all perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances, commonly referred to as PFAS, as hazardous substances within one year of enactment of this bill. PFAS are man-made and may have adverse human health effects. A variety of products contain the compounds, such as nonstick cookware or weatherproof clothing. The bill authorizes states to provide grants to owners of household water wells that have been contaminated by PFAS to purchase and install a household filtration system. Among other requirements, the EPA must establish pretreatment standards for PFAS introduced into publicly owned treatment works; implement various grant programs to assist with PFAS contamination, water infrastructure, and PFAS pretreatment standards; issue a final rule adding PFAS to the list of hazardous air pollutants and, within one year after issuing the rule, revise the list of air pollution sources to include categories and subcategories of major sources and area sources of PFAS; prohibit the disposal of firefighting foam (containing PFAS) by incineration; and identify additional wastes containing PFAS for which a prohibition on incineration may be necessary and prescribe such prohibitions. The bill bans the use of PFAS in food contact substances, which are substances intended for use as a component of materials in manufacturing, packing, packaging, transporting, or holding food, if such use is not intended to have a technical effect in such food. For criminal penalty purposes, wastes containing PFAS must be considered hazardous waste.
Title
Prevent Future American Sickness Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB535 (Related) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB2591 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
HB2605 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
HB2827 (Related) 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB638 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1599)
HB2591 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
HB2605 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
HB2827 (Related) 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB638 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1599)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Air quality
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Fires
Food industry and services
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Government lending and loan guarantees
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Manufacturing
Military facilities and property
Solid waste and recycling
State and local finance
Water quality
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Air quality
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Fires
Food industry and services
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Government lending and loan guarantees
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Manufacturing
Military facilities and property
Solid waste and recycling
State and local finance
Water quality
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3227/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3227/BILLS-116s3227is.pdf |