US SB32 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 725.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 725.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
California Desert Protection and Recreation Act of 2018 This bill amends the California Desert Protection Act of 1994 to, among other things: establish or designate wilderness areas, a special management area, off-highway vehicle recreation areas, and a national scenic area; release specified wilderness study areas; adjust national park and preserve boundaries; and specify land withdrawals and conveyances.Specified federal land shall be taken into trust for the Lone Pine Paiute-Shoshone Tribe. Lands and interests in land, including improvements, outside the boundary of Joshua Tree National Park in California may be acquired for the purpose of operating a visitor center.The bill makes amendments to the California Desert Protection Act of 1994 regarding the California State School lands.The bill amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate specified segments of rivers and creeks as components of the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System.The bill establishes the Renewable Energy Resource Conservation Fund for use in regions impacted by the development of wind or solar energy.
Title
California Desert Protection and Recreation Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 725. |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-421. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2017-01-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S114-115) |
Same As/Similar To
HB857 (Related) 2018-12-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 722.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Animal and plant health
California
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Endangered and threatened species
Energy revenues and royalties
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Forests, forestry, trees
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Historical and cultural resources
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Mining
Motor vehicles
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Reptiles
Veterinary medicine and animal diseases
Water quality
Water use and supply
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Animal and plant health
California
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Endangered and threatened species
Energy revenues and royalties
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Forests, forestry, trees
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Historical and cultural resources
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Mining
Motor vehicles
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Reptiles
Veterinary medicine and animal diseases
Water quality
Water use and supply
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection