US HB857 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 722.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 722.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
California Off-Road Recreation and Conservation Act This bill amends the California Desert Protection Act of 1994 to, among other things: establish or designate wilderness areas, off-highway vehicle recreation areas, and a national scenic area; release specified wilderness study areas; adjust national park and preserve boundaries; and specify land withdrawals and conveyances. Specified federal land shall be taken into trust for the Lone Pine Paiute-Shoshone Tribe. Lands and interests in land, including improvements, outside the boundary of Joshua Tree National Park in California, may be acquired for the purpose of operating a visitor center. The bill makes amendments to the California Desert Protection Act of 1994 regarding the California State School lands. The bill amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate specified segments of rivers and creeks as components of the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System.
Title
California Off-Road Recreation and Conservation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 722. |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-416. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-06-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5594-5601) |
2018-06-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 857. |
2018-06-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5594-5603) |
2018-06-25 | House | Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-05-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-05-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-16 | House | Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged. |
2018-05-16 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-02-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB32 (Related) 2018-12-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 725.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
California
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Forests, forestry, trees
Government studies and investigations
Historical and cultural resources
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Motor vehicles
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Water use and supply
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
California
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Forests, forestry, trees
Government studies and investigations
Historical and cultural resources
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Motor vehicles
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Water use and supply
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection