US SB3198 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates automatic cost of living adjustments for Members of Congress during FY2011.
Title
A bill to provide that Members of Congress shall not receive a cost of living adjustment in pay during fiscal year 2011.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Nelson [D-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB201 (Related) 2009-01-06 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB215 (Related) 2009-01-06 - Referred to House Rules
HB282 (Related) 2009-01-07 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB346 (Related) 2009-01-08 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB395 (Related) 2009-01-09 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB581 (Related) 2009-03-23 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Latta. Petition No: 111-1. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
HB751 (Related) 2009-01-28 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB1597 (Related) 2009-03-18 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB4336 (Related) 2009-12-16 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB4423 (Related) 2010-01-12 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB4761 (Related) 2010-03-11 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1326)
HB5146 (Related) 2010-05-14 - Became Public Law No: 111-165.
SB102 (Related) 2009-01-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB317 (Related) 2009-01-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S835)
SB542 (Related) 2009-03-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 29.
SB620 (Related) 2009-03-18 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
SB3074 (Related) 2010-03-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB3158 (Related) 2010-03-24 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 334.
SB3244 (Related) 2010-04-22 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB215 (Related) 2009-01-06 - Referred to House Rules
HB282 (Related) 2009-01-07 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB346 (Related) 2009-01-08 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB395 (Related) 2009-01-09 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB581 (Related) 2009-03-23 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Latta. Petition No: 111-1. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
HB751 (Related) 2009-01-28 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB1597 (Related) 2009-03-18 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB4336 (Related) 2009-12-16 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB4423 (Related) 2010-01-12 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB4761 (Related) 2010-03-11 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1326)
HB5146 (Related) 2010-05-14 - Became Public Law No: 111-165.
SB102 (Related) 2009-01-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB317 (Related) 2009-01-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S835)
SB542 (Related) 2009-03-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 29.
SB620 (Related) 2009-03-18 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
SB3074 (Related) 2010-03-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB3158 (Related) 2010-03-24 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 334.
SB3244 (Related) 2010-04-22 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-bill/3198/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/s3198/BILLS-111s3198is.pdf |