US SB102 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Legislative Reorganization Act of 1946 to eliminate automatic pay adjustments for Members of Congress. Makes it out of order in the Senate to consider a bill, amendment, resolution, or conference report containing any provision that adjusts the pay of Members of Congress, unless that provision has been subject to a roll call in the Senate. Permits waiver or suspension of such requirements, or successful appeals from rulings of the Chair, only by an affirmative vote of three-fifths (60) of the Senate.
Title
A bill to repeal the provision of law that provides automatic pay adjustments for Members of Congress.
Sponsors
Sen. John Ensign [R-NV] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-06 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB156 (Related) 2009-01-06 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB215 (Related) 2009-01-06 - Referred to House Rules
HB282 (Related) 2009-01-07 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB346 (Related) 2009-01-08 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB395 (Related) 2009-01-09 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB566 (Related) 2009-01-15 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB581 (Related) 2009-03-23 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Latta. Petition No: 111-1. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
HB751 (Related) 2009-01-28 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB1597 (Related) 2009-03-18 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB4255 (Related) 2009-12-16 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H14985-14986)
HB4423 (Related) 2010-01-12 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB4761 (Related) 2010-03-11 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1326)
HB5146 (Related) 2010-05-14 - Became Public Law No: 111-165.
SB317 (Related) 2009-01-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S835)
SB542 (Related) 2009-03-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 29.
SB620 (Related) 2009-03-18 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
SB3158 (Related) 2010-03-24 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 334.
SB3198 (Related) 2010-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB215 (Related) 2009-01-06 - Referred to House Rules
HB282 (Related) 2009-01-07 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB346 (Related) 2009-01-08 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB395 (Related) 2009-01-09 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB566 (Related) 2009-01-15 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB581 (Related) 2009-03-23 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Latta. Petition No: 111-1. (Discharge petition text with signatures.)
HB751 (Related) 2009-01-28 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB1597 (Related) 2009-03-18 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB4255 (Related) 2009-12-16 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H14985-14986)
HB4423 (Related) 2010-01-12 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
HB4761 (Related) 2010-03-11 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1326)
HB5146 (Related) 2010-05-14 - Became Public Law No: 111-165.
SB317 (Related) 2009-01-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S835)
SB542 (Related) 2009-03-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 29.
SB620 (Related) 2009-03-18 - Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
SB3158 (Related) 2010-03-24 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 334.
SB3198 (Related) 2010-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Congress
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Legislative rules and procedure
Members of Congress
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Legislative rules and procedure
Members of Congress
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-bill/102/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/s102/BILLS-111s102is.pdf |