US SB3172 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-06 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-423.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Restore Our Parks Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restore Our Parks Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-06SenateBy Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-423.
2018-12-04SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 713.
2018-12-04SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2018-10-02SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2018-07-11SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
2018-06-28SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB2584 (Related) 2018-03-20 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB751 (Related) 2017-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB6510 (Related) 2018-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 875.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback