US HB2584 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 22 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

National Park Service Legacy Act of 2017 This bill: (1) establishes the National Park Service Legacy Restoration Fund, and (2) requires specified amounts of federal mineral revenues that are not otherwise credited, covered, or deposited pursuant to federal law to be deposited into such fund each fiscal year through FY2047. Amounts in the fund shall be used for meeting high-priority deferred maintenance needs of the National Park Service (NPS) as follows: 20% shall be allocated to transportation-related projects that may be eligible for funding made available to the NPS through the federal lands transportation program or any similar federal land highway program administered by the Department of Transportation; and 80% shall be allocated for the repair and rehabilitation of assets for certain projects that are not eligible for funding under such programs, including historic assets, nonhistoric assets related to visitor access, health and safety, and recreation, and visitor facilities, water and utility systems, and employee housing. No fund amounts may be used by the NPS to acquire land or to supplant discretionary funding made available for annually recurring facility operations and maintenance needs. As part of its annual budget submission, the NPS shall submit a prioritized list of deferred maintenance projects proposed to be funded by such fund during the fiscal year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Park Service Legacy Act of 2017

Sponsors

Rep. Will Hurd [R]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D]Rep. David Reichert [R]Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D]
Rep. Erik Paulsen [R]Rep. Tom Cole [R]Rep. Fred Upton [R]Rep. Evan Jenkins [R]
Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D]Rep. Robert Brady [D]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D]
Rep. Lamar Smith [R]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D]Rep. Darren Soto [D]
Rep. Kevin Brady [R]Rep. Jared Polis [D]Rep. Alexander Mooney [R]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D]
Rep. Steve Stivers [R]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D]Rep. Jacky Rosen [D]Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R]
Rep. Michael Turner [R]Rep. Pete Sessions [R]Rep. Henry Cuellar [D]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D]
Rep. Edward Royce [R]Rep. Niki Tsongas [D]Rep. Barbara Lee [D]Sen. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R]
Rep. John Garamendi [D]Rep. Michael Doyle [D]Rep. John Duncan [R]Rep. Paul Cook [R]
Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D]Rep. Ryan Costello [R]Rep. Luis Correa [D]
Rep. David Valadao [R]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D]Rep. Mimi Walters [R]Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D]
Rep. John Faso [R]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D]Rep. Daniel Donovan [R]Rep. David McKinley [R]
Rep. Pete Aguilar [D]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D]Rep. Doris Matsui [D]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R]
Rep. Kay Granger [R]Rep. Ron Kind [D]Rep. French Hill [R]Rep. Mike Thompson [D]
Rep. John Katko [R]Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D]Rep. David Joyce [R]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D]
Rep. John Rutherford [R]Rep. Peter Welch [D]Rep. Rob Bishop [R]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D]
Rep. Mia Love [R]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D]Rep. Blake Farenthold [R]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D]
Rep. Brian Mast [R]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D]Rep. Patrick Meehan [R]Rep. Sean Maloney [D]
Rep. Robert Wittman [R]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D]Rep. Dennis Ross [R]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D]
Rep. Billy Long [R]Rep. Adam Smith [D]Rep. Earl Carter [R]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D]
Rep. Ted Poe [R]Rep. Diana DeGette [D]Rep. Virginia Foxx [R]Rep. Don Beyer [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2017-06-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-05-23HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
2017-05-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-05-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-05-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-05-22HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB751 (Same As) 2017-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3172 (Related) 2018-07-11 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback