US SB3094 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to improve homeless veterans reintegration programs, and for other purposes.
Title
Reaching Every Homeless Veteran Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-15 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5783 (Related) 2021-12-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/3094/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s3094/BILLS-117s3094is.pdf |