US SB3075 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill making appropriations for the Department of State, foreign operations, and related programs for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2022, and for other purposes.
Title
Department of State, Foreign Operations, and Related Programs Appropriations Act, 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4373 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1531 the House agreed to the Senate amendment.
HB2471 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Became Public Law No: 117-103.
HB2471 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Became Public Law No: 117-103.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/3075/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s3075/BILLS-117s3075is.pdf |