US SB3062 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill making appropriations for the Departments of Labor, Health and Human Services, and Education, and related agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2022, and for other purposes.
Title
Departments of Labor, Health and Human Services, and Education, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2022 Department of Education Appropriations Act, 2022 Department of Health and Human Services Appropriations Act, 2022 Department of Labor Appropriations Act, 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4502 (Related) 2021-08-03 - Received in the Senate.
HB2471 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Became Public Law No: 117-103.
HB2471 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Became Public Law No: 117-103.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/3062/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s3062/BILLS-117s3062is.pdf |