US SB3052 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides statutory authority for the trade agreement between the United States, Mexico, and Canada (USMCA), which replaces the North American Free Trade Agreement. Specifically, the bill implements provisions that include labor and environment monitoring and enforcement, de minimis levels for U.S. exports, and cooperation among treaty members to prevent duty evasion.
Title
United States-Mexico-Canada Agreement Implementation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB132 (Related) 2019-09-20 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 23.
HB5430 (Same As) 2020-10-21 - By Senator Grassley from Committee on Finance filed written report. Report No. 116-283. Additional views filed.
SB267 (Related) 2019-01-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB5430 (Same As) 2020-10-21 - By Senator Grassley from Committee on Finance filed written report. Report No. 116-283. Additional views filed.
SB267 (Related) 2019-01-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Appropriations
Canada
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Department of Agriculture
Department of Commerce
Department of Labor
Department of the Interior
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign trade and international finance
Free trade and trade barriers
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
International organizations and cooperation
Judicial review and appeals
Labor standards
Labor-management relations
Lakes and rivers
Latin America
Mexico
Motor carriers
Multilateral development programs
Office of the U.S. Trade Representative
Tariffs
Trade agreements and negotiations
Water quality
Watersheds
Canada
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Department of Agriculture
Department of Commerce
Department of Labor
Department of the Interior
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign trade and international finance
Free trade and trade barriers
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
International organizations and cooperation
Judicial review and appeals
Labor standards
Labor-management relations
Lakes and rivers
Latin America
Mexico
Motor carriers
Multilateral development programs
Office of the U.S. Trade Representative
Tariffs
Trade agreements and negotiations
Water quality
Watersheds
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3052/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3052/BILLS-116s3052is.pdf |