US SB3004 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alaska Native Claims Settlement Improvement Act of 2016
Title
Alaska Native Claims Settlement Improvement Act of 2016
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2386 (Related) 2015-06-17 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB2387 (Related) 2016-11-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 653.
SB872 (Related) 2015-10-08 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
SB1955 (Related) 2015-10-08 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
HB2387 (Related) 2016-11-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 653.
SB872 (Related) 2015-10-08 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
SB1955 (Related) 2015-10-08 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
Subjects
Alaska
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Cemeteries and funerals
Federal-Indian relations
Forests, forestry, trees
Government trust funds
Historical and cultural resources
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Mining
Monuments and memorials
Native Americans
Oil and gas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Cemeteries and funerals
Federal-Indian relations
Forests, forestry, trees
Government trust funds
Historical and cultural resources
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Mining
Monuments and memorials
Native Americans
Oil and gas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/3004/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s3004/BILLS-114s3004is.pdf |