US SB2996 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing Chemical Facilities Antiterrorism Security Act of 2010 - Amends the Department of Homeland Security Appropriations Act, 2007 to extend until October 4, 2015, the authority of the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) to issue interim final regulations establishing risk-based performance standards for security of chemical facilities and requiring vulnerability assessments and the development and implementation of site security plans for such facilities. Requires the Secretary, acting through the Administrator of the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) and in coordination with the Under Secretary for National Protection and Programs, to: (1) establish a voluntary chemical security training program to enhance the capabilities of high-risk chemical facilities to prevent, prepare for, respond to, mitigate against, and recover from acts of terrorism, natural disasters, and other man-made disasters; and (2) develop a voluntary chemical security exercise program to offer voluntary testing and evaluation of the capabilities of the federal government, state governments, commercial personnel and management, emergency response providers, and the private sector to prevent, prepare for, mitigate against, respond to, and recover from acts of terrorism, natural disasters, and other emergencies at chemical facilities.
Title
Continuing Chemical Facilities Antiterrorism Security Act of 2010
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] | Sen. Mark Pryor [D-AR] | Sen. George Voinovich [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held. | |
2010-02-04 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-02-04 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S492-493) |
Same As/Similar To
HB5186 (Same As) 2010-05-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation Security and Infrastructure Protection.
Subjects
Accidents
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency planning and evacuation
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Industrial facilities
Manufacturing
Natural disasters
Performance measurement
Terrorism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-bill/2996/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/s2996/BILLS-111s2996is.pdf |