US SB2991 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-322.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 117-322.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish a Department of Homeland Security Center for Countering Human Trafficking, and for other purposes.
Title
Countering Human Trafficking Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-27 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-322. |
2022-12-27 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-12-23 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-12-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-14 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9823-9824) |
2022-12-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2991. |
2022-12-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9823-9826) |
2022-12-14 | House | Mr. Nadler moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-04-07 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-04-07 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Star Print ordered on the reported bill. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S2055-2056) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | S.Amdt.5019 Amendment SA 5019 proposed by Senator Schumer for Senator Peters. (consideration: CR S2055-2056; text: CR S2055-2056) In the nature of a substitute. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | S.Amdt.5019 Amendment SA 5019 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (CR S2055) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2054-2056) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 272. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 117-73. |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6736 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.