US SB2971 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 408.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 408.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend and reauthorize the Child Abuse Prevention and Treatment Act, and for other purposes.
Title
CAPTA Reauthorization Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 408. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-12-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
SB85 (Related) 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2969 (Related) 2019-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1160 (Related) 2020-09-22 - Held at the desk.
SB2969 (Related) 2019-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1160 (Related) 2020-09-22 - Held at the desk.