US SB1160 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-22 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-22 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises various programs that address the prevention and treatment of child abuse. For example, the bill expands the Child Welfare Information Gateway to include best practices for referrals to resources for physical, behavioral, mental health, and developmental needs.The bill also revises child abuse research programs to include elements such as (1) effective community-based resources that support behavioral and mental health; and (2) effective methods to address geographic, racial, and cultural inequities in the child welfare system. Additionally, the bill requires specified grants programs for child abuse and neglect to (1) include training about trauma-informed practices, and (2) provide specified services that address the mental health of children and families in the child welfare system.
Title
Supporting Family Mental Health in CAPTA Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-09-22 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-09-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.2659 Amendment SA 2659 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-09-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.2659 Amendment SA 2659 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Smith. (consideration: CR S5717; text: CR S5717) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5716-5717) |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2503 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB2971 (Related) 2020-01-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 408.
SB2971 (Related) 2020-01-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 408.
Subjects
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Domestic violence and child abuse
Employment and training programs
Family services
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Indian social and development programs
Intergovernmental relations
Mental health
Child safety and welfare
Domestic violence and child abuse
Employment and training programs
Family services
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Indian social and development programs
Intergovernmental relations
Mental health