US SB2966 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stop Secret Foreign Interference in Elections Act
Title
Stop Secret Foreign Interference in Elections Act
Sponsors
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2338 (Related) 2017-05-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3537 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB3848 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
HB6239 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Financial Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1585 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB1880 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3150 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB3537 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HB3848 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
HB6239 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Financial Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1585 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB1880 (Related) 2017-09-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3150 (Related) 2018-06-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/2966/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s2966/BILLS-115s2966is.pdf |