US SB2906 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 111-336.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 111-336.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits land held in trust for the Kalispel Tribe of Indians and the Puyallup Tribe of Indians to be leased for a term of greater than 25 years. Includes the Puyallup Tribe of Indians, the Swinomish Indian Tribal Community, or the Kalispel Tribe of Indians among those tribes and tribal organizations permitted to lease restricted lands under specified conditions without the Secretary of the Interior's approval.
Title
A bill to amend the Act of August 9, 1955, to modify a provision relating to leases involving certain Indian tribes.
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-22 | Became Public Law No: 111-336. | |
2010-12-22 | Signed by President. | |
2010-12-16 | Presented to President. | |
2010-12-14 | Cleared for White House. | |
2010-12-14 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-12-14 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8299) | |
2010-12-14 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2906. | |
2010-12-14 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8299-8300) | |
2010-12-14 | Mr. Rahall moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2010-09-23 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. | |
2010-09-23 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-09-23 | Received in the House. | |
2010-09-22 | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7364; text as passed Senate: CR S7364) | |
2010-08-03 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 508. | |
2010-08-03 | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Dorgan with amendments. With written report No. 111-246. | |
2010-06-10 | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. | |
2009-12-18 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4401 (Same As) 2009-12-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.