US SB2899 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CRIB Act Caring Recovery for Infants and Babies Act This bill allows state Medicaid programs to cover residential pediatric recovery center services for infants with neonatal abstinence syndrome.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIB Act Caring Recovery for Infants and Babies Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Same As/Similar To

HB6004 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HR1099 (Related) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3120 (Related) 2018-06-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 484.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback