US SB3120 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 484.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 484.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEAL Act of 2018 Helping to End Addiction and Lessen Substance Use Disorders Act of 2018
Title
HEAL Act of 2018 Helping to End Addiction and Lessen Substance Use Disorders Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 484. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Committee on Finance. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Hatch. With written report No. 115-284. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2891 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2900 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2902 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2904 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2905 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2908 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2909 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2910 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2911 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2912 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2920 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2921 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2922 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2923 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2924 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2892 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6778 (Related) 2018-09-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB4841 (Related) 2018-06-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 581.
SB2899 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6004 (Related) 2018-06-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HB5715 (Related) 2018-06-12 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-737, Part I.
HR1099 (Related) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2926 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2900 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2902 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2904 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2905 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2908 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2909 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2910 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2911 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2912 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2920 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2921 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2922 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2923 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2924 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2892 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6778 (Related) 2018-09-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB4841 (Related) 2018-06-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 581.
SB2899 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6004 (Related) 2018-06-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB6 (Related) 2018-10-24 - Became Public Law No: 115-271.
HB5715 (Related) 2018-06-12 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-737, Part I.
HR1099 (Related) 2018-09-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2926 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Adoption and foster care
American Samoa
Caribbean area
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Family relationships
Family services
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Guam
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing supply and affordability
Medicaid
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Mental health
Northern Mariana Islands
Prescription drugs
Puerto Rico
State and local government operations
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
Women's health
American Samoa
Caribbean area
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Family relationships
Family services
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Guam
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing supply and affordability
Medicaid
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Mental health
Northern Mariana Islands
Prescription drugs
Puerto Rico
State and local government operations
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/3120/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s3120/BILLS-115s3120pcs.pdf |