US SB289 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 7.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FISA Sunsets Extension Act of 2011 - Amends the USA PATRIOT Improvement and Reauthorization Act of 2005 to extend through December 31, 2013, a provision granting roving electronic surveillance authority. Amends the Intelligence Reform and Terrorism Prevention Act of 2004 to extend until December 31, 2013, a provision revising the definition of an "agent of a foreign power" to include any non-U.S. person who engages in international terrorism or preparatory activities ("lone wolf" provision). Amends the FISA Amendments Act of 2008 to extend through December 31, 2013, certain additional procedures concerning the electronic surveillance of certain persons outside the United States for foreign intelligence information purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FISA Sunsets Extension Act of 2011

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-04SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 7.
2011-02-03SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
2011-02-03SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S549-550)

Same As/Similar To

SB149 (Same As) 2011-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1022 (Related) 2011-05-19 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 58.
SB1038 (Related) 2011-05-24 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure tabled in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 74 - 13. Record Vote Number: 76.
SB1114 (Related) 2011-05-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3276 (Related) 2012-09-20 - By Senator Leahy from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 112-229. Additional and Minority views filed.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback