US SB1022 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 58.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 58.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PATRIOT Sunsets Extension Act of 2011 - Amends the USA PATRIOT Improvement and Reauthorization Act of 2005 to extend through December 31, 2014, a provision granting roving electronic surveillance authority. Amends the Intelligence Reform and Terrorism Prevention Act of 2004 to extend until December 31, 2014, a provision revising the definition of an "agent of a foreign power" to include any non-U.S. person who engages in international terrorism or preparatory activities ("lone wolf" provision).
Title
PATRIOT Sunsets Extension Act of 2011
Sponsors
Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 58. |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3109) |
Same As/Similar To
SB289 (Related) 2011-02-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 7.
SB1038 (Related) 2011-05-24 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure tabled in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 74 - 13. Record Vote Number: 76.
HB1963 (Related) 2011-07-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1114 (Related) 2011-05-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1038 (Related) 2011-05-24 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure tabled in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 74 - 13. Record Vote Number: 76.
HB1963 (Related) 2011-07-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1114 (Related) 2011-05-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Homeland security
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Terrorism
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Homeland security
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Terrorism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/1022/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s1022/BILLS-112s1022pcs.pdf |