US SB2860 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals specified limitations, for purposes of Medicare participation, on self-referrals by newly constructed or expanded physician-owned hospitals.
Title
Patient Access to Higher Quality Health Care Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] |
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] |
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB506 (Related) 2019-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1332 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3062 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB8098 (Related) 2020-08-25 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1332 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3062 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB8098 (Related) 2020-08-25 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2860/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2860/BILLS-116s2860is.pdf |