US SB2809 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-440.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-19 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-440.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Emery County Public Land Management Act of 2018 This bill establishes the San Rafael Swell Western Heritage and Historic Mining National Conservation Area, consisting of 336,467 acres in Utah. The bill also amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate a 54-mile segment of Green River, which is located in the area, as a component of the national wild and scenic rivers system. Over 500,000 acres in Utah are designated as national wilderness areas, including Candland Mountain, Crack Canyon, Desolation Canyon, Devil's Canyon, Horseshoe Canyon (North), Mexican Mountain, Muddy Creek, Nelson Mountain, San Rafael Reef, and Sid's Mountain. With respect to the newly established conservation area and wilderness areas, the bill: allows for commercial services to the extent necessary to fulfill the areas' recreational or other purposes; allows the grazing of livestock, if already established, to continue; allows for the "casual collection" (for noncommercial use) of plants, rocks, and minerals; and otherwise provides for management by the Department of the Interior. In addition, with respect to other land in Utah, the bill provides for: the cooperative (state and federal) management of the Temple Mountain Cooperative Management Area (7,792 acres); the management of the Goblin Valley State Park Expansion as a state park; the establishment and management of the Jurassic National Monument (2,534 acres); and public purpose conveyances, by Interior to the applicable local government entity, of the Huntington Airport (1,400 acres), the Emery City Recreation Area (640 acres), the State Road 6 Emery Sheriff's Office substation site (640 acres), and the Buckhorn Information Center (65 acres).
Title
Emery County Public Land Management Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-19 | Senate | By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-440. |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 721. |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5727 (Same As) 2018-12-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 832.
SB3803 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3803 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Livestock
Mining
Monuments and memorials
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
State and local government operations
Utah
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Livestock
Mining
Monuments and memorials
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
State and local government operations
Utah
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats