US HB5727 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 832.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 832.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Emery County Public Land Management Act of 2018
Title
Emery County Public Land Management Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 832. |
2018-12-10 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1071. |
2018-09-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-09-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-09-26 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2018-06-21 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2018-05-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2018-05-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2809 (Same As) 2018-12-19 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-440.
SB3803 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3803 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Livestock
Mining
Monuments and memorials
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
State and local government operations
Utah
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Livestock
Mining
Monuments and memorials
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
State and local government operations
Utah
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats