US SB2735 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Internet Tax Freedom Act to extend until December 31, 2014: (1) the ban on state and local taxation of Internet access and on multiple or discriminatory taxes on electronic commerce, and (2) the grandfather provisions allowing states that imposed and enforced laws imposing a tax on internet access prior to October 1, 1998, to continue enforcing such laws.
Title
A bill to provide for an extension of the Internet Tax Freedom Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pryor [D-AR] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-31 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2609 (Related) 2014-11-12 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S5902)
Subjects
Internet and video services
Retail and wholesale trades
Sales and excise taxes
State and local government operations
State and local taxation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Retail and wholesale trades
Sales and excise taxes
State and local government operations
State and local taxation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/2735/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s2735/BILLS-113s2735is.pdf |