US SB2677 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
In the Red Act of 2016
Title
In the Red Act of 2016
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2103 (Related) 2015-04-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2889 (Related) 2015-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2962 (Related) 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
SB1127 (Related) 2015-04-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2532)
SB1686 (Related) 2015-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1716 (Related) 2015-07-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB5106 (Same As) 2016-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
HB2889 (Related) 2015-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2962 (Related) 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
SB1127 (Related) 2015-04-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2532)
SB1686 (Related) 2015-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1716 (Related) 2015-07-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB5106 (Same As) 2016-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Subjects
Academic performance and assessments
Accounting and auditing
Capital gains tax
Corporate finance and management
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Employee benefits and pensions
Energy revenues and royalties
Financial services and investments
Foreign and international corporations
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Income tax rates
Indian social and development programs
Inflation and prices
Legislative rules and procedure
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Minority education
Oil and gas
Securities
Senate
Student aid and college costs
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation of foreign income
Vocational and technical education
Wages and earnings
Accounting and auditing
Capital gains tax
Corporate finance and management
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Employee benefits and pensions
Energy revenues and royalties
Financial services and investments
Foreign and international corporations
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Income tax rates
Indian social and development programs
Inflation and prices
Legislative rules and procedure
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Minority education
Oil and gas
Securities
Senate
Student aid and college costs
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation of foreign income
Vocational and technical education
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/2677/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s2677/BILLS-114s2677is.pdf |