US HB5106 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
In the Red Act of 2016
Title
In the Red Act of 2016
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2016-05-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2016-04-28 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2016-04-28 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2016-04-28 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2016-04-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2016-04-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2677 (Same As) 2016-03-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Academic performance and assessments
Accounting and auditing
Capital gains tax
Corporate finance and management
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Employee benefits and pensions
Energy revenues and royalties
Financial services and investments
Foreign and international corporations
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Income tax rates
Indian social and development programs
Inflation and prices
Legislative rules and procedure
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Minority education
Oil and gas
Securities
Senate
Student aid and college costs
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation of foreign income
Vocational and technical education
Wages and earnings
Accounting and auditing
Capital gains tax
Corporate finance and management
Education
Education of the disadvantaged
Education programs funding
Employee benefits and pensions
Energy revenues and royalties
Financial services and investments
Foreign and international corporations
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Income tax rates
Indian social and development programs
Inflation and prices
Legislative rules and procedure
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Minority education
Oil and gas
Securities
Senate
Student aid and college costs
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation of foreign income
Vocational and technical education
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/5106/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr5106/BILLS-114hr5106ih.pdf |