US SB265 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-15 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-15 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to reauthorize the rural emergency medical service training and equipment assistance program, and for other purposes.
Title
SIREN Reauthorization Act Supporting and Improving Rural EMS Needs Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. John Hickenlooper [D-CO] |
Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-15 | House | Held at the desk. |
2023-12-15 | House | Received in the House. |
2023-12-14 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5966-5967; text: CR S5966) |
2023-07-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 173. |
2023-07-26 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Sanders with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S236) |
Same As/Similar To
HB4646 (Related) 2024-03-20 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 46 - 0.