US SB2620 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 602.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-06 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 602.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to facilitate the addition of park administration at the Coltsville National Historical Park, and for other purposes. (Sec. 1) This bill amends the Carl Levin and Howard P. "Buck" McKeon National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2015 to revise a condition for establishment of the Coltsville National Historical Park in Connecticut to require the state, the city, or the private property owner, as appropriate, to enter into a written agreement with the Department of the Interior to donate at least 10,000 square feet of space in the Colt Armory Complex (currently referred to as the East Armory).
Title
A bill to facilitate the addition of park administration at the Coltsville National Historical Park, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 602. |
2016-09-06 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 114-329. |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2857 (Related) 2016-04-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Connecticut
Historic sites and heritage areas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Historic sites and heritage areas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources