US SB2614 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-09 - By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 114-397.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-09 - By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 114-397.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Kevin and Avonte's Law of 2016 TITLE I--MISSING ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE PATIENT ALERT PROGRAM REAUTHORIZATION Missing Americans Alert Program Act of 2016 (Sec. 102) This bill amends the Violent Crime Control and Law Enforcement Act of 1994 to revise and rename the Missing Alzheimer's Disease Patient Alert Program as the Missing Americans Alert Program and to reauthorize it through FY2021. It directs the Department of Justice's (DOJ's) Bureau of Justice Assistance (BJA) to award grants to state and local law enforcement or public safety agencies to develop tracking technology programs to locate missing individuals with dementia or children with developmental disabilities. The BJA must give preference to grant applicants that partner with nonprofit organizations directly linked to individuals, and families of individuals, with dementia or developmental disabilities. Additionally, it directs the BJA to award competitive grants to state and local law enforcement or public safety agencies and nonprofit organizations to develop or operate locally based proactive programs to prevent wandering and locate missing individuals with dementia or children with developmental disabilities. The bill subjects grants under the Missing Americans Program to accountability provisions. DOJ's Office of Inspector General must conduct annual audits of selected grant recipients. The bill prohibits grants to nonprofit organizations that hold money in an offshore account to avoid tax liability. It also limits the use of grants under this bill for conferences that use more than $20,000 in DOJ funds. DOJ must identify and report on duplicative grant awards. DOJ must also report annually to Congress certain information regarding the Missing Americans Alert Program. TITLE II--EDUCATION AND OUTREACH (Sec. 201) The bill amends the Missing Children's Assistance Act to specify that, with respect to training and technical assistance provided by the National Center for Missing and Exploited Children, cases involving missing and exploited children include cases involving children with developmental disabilities such as autism. TITLE III--PRIVACY PROTECTIONS (Sec. 302) DOJ must establish and certain grant recipients must comply with standards and best practices related to the use of tracking technology to locate missing individuals with dementia or developmental disabilities.
Title
Kevin and Avonte's Law of 2016
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-09 | House | By Senator Grassley from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 114-397. |
2016-07-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2016-07-18 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2016-07-18 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-07-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2016-07-18 | House | Received in the House. |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. |
2016-07-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.4976 Amendment SA 4976 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-07-14 | Senate | S.Amdt.4976 Amendment SA 4976 proposed by Senator Murkowski for Senator Grassley. (consideration: CR S5185) |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5185) |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 423. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Grassley without amendment. Without written report. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4919 (Same As) 2016-12-08 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Aging
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Crime and law enforcement
Department of Justice
Disability and paralysis
Family services
First responders and emergency personnel
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Law enforcement administration and funding
Neurological disorders
Right of privacy
Aging
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Crime and law enforcement
Department of Justice
Disability and paralysis
Family services
First responders and emergency personnel
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Law enforcement administration and funding
Neurological disorders
Right of privacy