US SB26 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Bonneville Unit Clean Hydropower Facilitation Act - Declares that, in order to facilitate hydropower development on the Diamond Fork System (Utah), a certain amount of reimbursable costs allocated to project power in the Power Appendix of the October 2004 Supplement to the 1988 Bonneville Unit Definite Plan Report shall be considered final costs, as well as specified costs in excess of the total maximum repayment obligation, subject to the same terms and conditions. States that: (1) this Act does not obligate the Western Area Power Administration to purchase or market any of the power produced by the Diamond Fork power plant, and (2) none of the costs associated with development of transmission facilities to transmit power from the Diamond Fork power plant shall be assigned to power for the purpose of Colorado River Storage Project ratemaking. Prohibits any hydroelectric power generation or transmission facility on the Diamond Fork System from being financed or refinanced with any obligation: (1) whose interest enjoys federal tax-exempt status, or (2) which enjoys certain federal tax credits. Directs the Secretary of the Interior to report to certain congressional committees if hydropower production on the Diamond Fork System has not commenced 24 months after enactment of this Act, stating the reasons such production has not commenced, and presenting a detailed timeline for future hydropower production. Prohibits the use of Western Area Power Administration borrowing authority under the Hoover Power Plant Act of 1984 to fund any study or construction of transmission facilities developed as a result of this Act.
Title
Bonneville Unit Clean Hydropower Facilitation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | House | Held at the desk. |
2013-06-20 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2013-06-20 | House | Received in the House. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4717-4722; text as passed Senate: CR S4718) |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 47. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden without amendment. With written report No. 113-16. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB254 (Same As) 2013-07-18 - Became Public Law No: 113-20.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Public utilities and utility rates
Utah
Water use and supply
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Public utilities and utility rates
Utah
Water use and supply