US HB254 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Became Public Law No: 113-20.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Became Public Law No: 113-20.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bonneville Unit Clean Hydropower Facilitation Act - Declares that, in order to facilitate hydropower development on the Diamond Fork System (Utah), a certain amount of reimbursable costs allocated to project power in the Power Appendix of the October 2004 Supplement to the 1988 Bonneville Unit Definite Plan Report shall be considered final costs, as well as specified costs in excess of the total maximum repayment obligation, subject to the same terms and conditions. States that: (1) this Act does not obligate the Western Area Power Administration to purchase or market any of the power produced by the Diamond Fork power plant; and (2) none of the costs associated with development of transmission facilities to transmit power from the Diamond Fork power plant shall be assigned to power for the purpose of Colorado River Storage Project ratemaking. Prohibits any hydroelectric power generation or transmission facility on the Diamond Fork System from being financed or refinanced with any obligation: (1) whose interest enjoys federal tax-exempt status; or (2) which enjoys certain federal tax credits. Directs the Secretary of the Interior to report to certain congressional committees if hydropower production on the Diamond Fork System has not commenced 24 months after enactment of this Act, stating the reasons such production has not commenced, and presenting a detailed timeline for future hydropower production. Prohibits the use of Western Area Power Administration borrowing authority under the Hoover Power Plant Act of 1984 to fund any study or construction of transmission facilities developed as a result of this Act.
Title
Bonneville Unit Clean Hydropower Facilitation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-09 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 400 N: 4 NV: 27 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-18 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-20. |
2013-07-18 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2013-07-12 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2013-07-10 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5623) |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2013-04-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-04-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 400 - 4 (Roll no. 90). (text: CR H1841-1842) |
2013-04-09 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1845) |
2013-04-09 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2013-04-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 254. |
2013-04-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1841-1842) |
2013-04-09 | House | Mr. Wittman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 13. |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee on Budget discharged. |
2013-04-09 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-25, Part I. |
2013-03-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-03-20 | House | Subcommittee on Water and Power Discharged. |
2013-03-05 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-01-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power. |
2013-01-15 | House | Referred to House Budget |
2013-01-15 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2013-01-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB26 (Same As) 2013-06-20 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Public utilities and utility rates
Utah
Water use and supply
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Public utilities and utility rates
Utah
Water use and supply