US SB256 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Combat Methamphetamine Enhancement Act of 2009 - Amends the Controlled Substances Act to require all regulated retail sellers of certain listed chemical products used to make methamphetamine to submit self-certifications of compliance with the requirements of such Act to the Attorney General. Requires the Attorney General to develop a list of all self-certified individuals and make it publicly available on the website of the Drug Enforcement Administration (DEA). Prohibits distributors of listed chemical products from selling such products to individuals not currently registered with the DEA. Impose civil penalties for negligent failure to self-certify as required by this Act.
Title
Combat Methamphetamine Enhancement Act of 2009
Sponsors
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Evan Bayh [D-IN] | Sen. Jeff Bingaman [D-NM] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] |
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. John Ensign [R-NV] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Tim Johnson [D-SD] | Sen. John Kerry [D-MA] |
Sen. Jon Kyl [R-AZ] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
Sen. Benjamin Nelson [D-NE] | Sen. Mark Pryor [D-AR] | Sen. Harry Reid [D-NV] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-19 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. | |
2009-06-09 | Referred to House Judiciary | |
2009-06-09 | Referred to House Energy and Commerce | |
2009-06-09 | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. | |
2009-06-09 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2009-06-09 | Received in the House. | |
2009-06-08 | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6315-6316; text as passed Senate: CR S6315-6316) | |
2009-03-23 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 38. | |
2009-03-23 | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy without amendment. Without written report. | |
2009-03-05 | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported favorably. | |
2009-01-15 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S615) | |
2009-01-15 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S614-615) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2923 (Same As) 2010-10-12 - Became Public Law No: 111-268.
Subjects
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Government information and archives
Retail and wholesale trades