US SB2557 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions related to federal financial student aid. Specifically, the bill replaces the expected family contribution metric with a student aid index used to assess a family's financial need and approximate their financial resources to contribute to a student's higher education expenses. The bill also revises the process for filing a Free Application for Federal Student Aid (FAFSA), and it removes certain eligibility requirements related to drug-related offenses and registration with the Selective Service System. The bill reauthorizes the Pell Grant program through FY2021, establishes a new eligibility formula for Pell Grants, and increases the maximum Pell Grant award. The Department of Education (ED) must conduct certain activities to educate students and their families about Pell Grant eligibility at a younger age. In addition, the bill expands Pell Grant eligibility to (1) certain incarcerated individuals; and (2) students enrolled in short-term programs that provide training in high-skill, high-wage, or in-demand industry sectors or occupations. ED must develop a standard terminology and format for financial aid offers, which shall provide certain information such as costs, grant and scholarship aid, annual net price, work-study, loans, and accepting or declining aid. In addition, the bill provides that a borrower on a 10-year standard loan repayment plan shall not be subject to a maximum monthly payment or any other maximum monthly payment. Further, the bill makes funding for historically black colleges and universities and other minority-serving institutions permanent.
Title
Student Aid Improvement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2321 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB888 (Related) 2019-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2667 (Related) 2019-10-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5970-5972)
SB888 (Related) 2019-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2667 (Related) 2019-10-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5970-5972)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Adoption and foster care
American Samoa
Caribbean area
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Department of Education
Education
Education programs funding
Employment taxes
Family relationships
Financial literacy
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Guam
Higher education
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Human trafficking
Inflation and prices
Marriage and family status
Marshall Islands
Micronesia
Military personnel and dependents
Minority education
Northern Mariana Islands
Oceania
Palau
Puerto Rico
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
State and local taxation
Student aid and college costs
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Temporary and part-time employment
U.S. territories and protectorates
User charges and fees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Wages and earnings
Adoption and foster care
American Samoa
Caribbean area
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Department of Education
Education
Education programs funding
Employment taxes
Family relationships
Financial literacy
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Guam
Higher education
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Human trafficking
Inflation and prices
Marriage and family status
Marshall Islands
Micronesia
Military personnel and dependents
Minority education
Northern Mariana Islands
Oceania
Palau
Puerto Rico
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
State and local taxation
Student aid and college costs
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Temporary and part-time employment
U.S. territories and protectorates
User charges and fees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/2557/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s2557/BILLS-116s2557is.pdf |