US SB2527 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-272.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-272.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small Business Investment Opportunity Act of 2018 This bill amends the Small Business Investment Act of 1958 to increase the maximum amount of outstanding leverage (i.e., borrowing power) made available to any licensed small business investment company from $150 million to $175 million.
Title
Small Business Investment Opportunity Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-272. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 353. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1580-1581) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2333 (Related) 2018-06-21 - Became Public Law No: 115-187. (TXT | PDF)