US SB2513 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Introduced on July 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-15 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the application and review process of the Department of Veterans Affairs for clothing allowance claims submitted by veterans, and for other purposes.
Title
Brian Neuman Department of Veterans Affairs Clothing Allowance Improvement Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-15 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2021-07-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5144) |
Same As/Similar To
HB4772 (Related) 2022-12-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/2513/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s2513/BILLS-117s2513is.pdf |