US SB2513 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the primary government agency investigating an act of terrorism to submit to Congress an unclassified report within one year after the agency completes its investigation. The agency shall conduct such investigation in collaboration with the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), the Department of Justice (DOJ), the Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI), and the National Counterterrorism Center. Such requirement shall not apply in instances in which DHS, DOJ, the FBI, or the center determines that the information required to be reported could jeopardize an ongoing investigation or prosecution, in which case the principal agency making such determination must notify Congress. Such a report shall (1) identify any gaps in national security that could be addressed to prevent future acts of terrorism, and (2) include any recommendations for additional measures that could be taken to improve homeland security.
Title
REPORT Act Reporting Efficiently to Proper Officials in Response to Terrorism Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-17 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-12-17 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7561-7562; text: CR S7562) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 329. |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment. With written report No. 116-175. |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4815 (Related) 2019-11-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Counterterrorism.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Law enforcement administration and funding
Terrorism
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Law enforcement administration and funding
Terrorism