US SB2497 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on August 3 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-12 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

United States-Israel Security Assistance Authorization Act of 2018 This bill extends security assistance to Israel. Specifically, it extends: foreign military financing assistance to Israel through FY2028, loan guarantees through FY2023, and authority for the war reserves stockpile through FY2023. The President may: enter into a cooperative agreement with Israel for research and joint production of anti-drone defense articles; conduct a joint assessment with Israel regarding which precision guided munitions Israel needs in a sustained armed confrontation with Hezbollah, Hamas, or other groups; and transfer precision guided munitions and defense articles to such stockpile. The bill directs the Department of Defense to provide for the rapid acquisition and deployment of precision guided munitions for U.S. counterterrorism missions or to assist an ally under missile threat from a terrorist organization or a country that supports international terrorism. The President shall report to Congress describing the steps taken to include Israel in the list of countries eligible for the strategic trade authorization exception. Such exception allows a controlled item to be exported without a transaction-specific license. The National Aeronautics and Space Administration shall continue to work with the Israel Space Agency to pursue peaceful space exploration and science initiatives. The bill also requires the periodic reports on Israel's qualitative military edge to include information about Israel's ability to defend itself from regional state and non-state actors and from drone, cyber, and asymmetric threats.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

United States-Israel Security Assistance Authorization Act of 2018

Sponsors

Sen. Marco Rubio [R]Sen. Christopher Coons [D]Sen. Robert Casey [D]Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D]
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D]Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D]Sen. Pat Roberts [R]Sen. Mike Rounds [R]
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R]Sen. Johnny Isakson [R]Sen. Ron Wyden [D]Sen. Ted Cruz [R]
Sen. John Hoeven [R]Sen. James Inhofe [R]Sen. Orrin Hatch [R]Sen. Maria Cantwell [D]
Sen. Mike Crapo [R]Sen. Shelley Capito [R]Sen. John Kennedy [R]Sen. Edward Markey [D]
Sen. Roger Wicker [R]Sen. Tim Scott [R]Sen. Joe Donnelly [D]Sen. Dan Sullivan [R]
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D]Sen. Bill Nelson [D]Sen. Todd Young [R]Sen. Susan Collins [R]
Sen. Tina Smith [D]Sen. John Cornyn [R]Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D]Sen. Dean Heller [R]
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D]Sen. James Risch [R]Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D]Sen. Tim Kaine [D]
Sen. Angus King [I]Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D]Sen. Jerry Moran [R]Sen. Roy Blunt [R]
Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D]Sen. Mark Warner [D]Sen. Jon Tester [D]Sen. David Perdue [R]
Sen. John Boozman [R]Sen. Cory Gardner [R]Sen. Michael Bennet [D]Sen. Christopher Murphy [D]
Sen. Jeff Flake [R]Sen. Pat Toomey [R]Sen. Martin Heinrich [D]Sen. Gary Peters [D]
Sen. Cory Booker [D]Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R]Sen. Joe Manchin [D]Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D]
Sen. Robert Menendez [D]Sen. Chuck Grassley [R]Sen. Doug Jones [D]Sen. Joni Ernst [R]
Sen. Ben Sasse [R]Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D]Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D]Sen. Rob Portman [R]
Sen. James Lankford [R]Sen. Margaret Hassan [D]Sen. Mazie Hirono [D]Sen. Mike Lee [R]
Sen. Steve Daines [R]Sen. Claire McCaskill [D]Sen. Sherrod Brown [D]Sen. Charles Schumer [D]
Sen. John Thune [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-12HouseMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
2018-09-12HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-12HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8145-8146)
2018-09-12HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2497.
2018-09-12HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8145-8150)
2018-09-12HouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2018-08-03HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-08-03HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-08-03HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-08-03HouseReceived in the House.
2018-08-02SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-08-01SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S5570-5572)
2018-08-01SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
2018-08-01SenateS.Amdt.3690 Amendment SA 3690 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2018-08-01SenateS.Amdt.3690 Amendment SA 3690 proposed by Senator Gardner for Senator Rubio. (consideration: CR S5569-5570; text: CR S5569-5570) To make improvements to the bill.
2018-08-01SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5567-5572)
2018-07-17SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 519.
2018-07-17SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2018-07-10SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2018-03-05SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

HB5141 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
HB1159 (Related) 2017-12-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB5117 (Related) 2018-02-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SB2504 (Related) 2018-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback