US HB1159 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
United States and Israel Space Cooperation Act (Sec. 3) This bill directs the National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA) to continue to work with the Israel Space Agency in identifying and cooperatively pursuing peaceful space exploration and science initiatives in areas of mutual interest, taking all appropriate measures to protect sensitive information, intellectual property, trade secrets, and economic interests of the United States.
Title
United States and Israel Space Cooperation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Jim Bridenstine [R-OK] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] |
Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. John Delaney [D-MD] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] |
Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. James Renacci [R-OH] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] |
Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R-CA] | Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] |
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] |
Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] |
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] |
Rep. John Faso [R-NY] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-20 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 700 (Y: 411 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2017-12-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-12-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 0 (Roll no. 700). (text: CR 12/18/2017 H10161) |
2017-12-20 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10312-10313) |
2017-12-18 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-12-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1159. |
2017-12-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10161-10162) |
2017-12-18 | House | Mr. Dunn moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-09-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-09-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Space. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5141 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
SB2504 (Related) 2018-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB2497 (Related) 2018-09-12 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
SB2504 (Related) 2018-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB2497 (Related) 2018-09-12 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
Subjects
International organizations and cooperation
Israel
Middle East
Science, technology, communications
Scientific communication
Space flight and exploration
Israel
Middle East
Science, technology, communications
Scientific communication
Space flight and exploration