US SB248 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to block implementation of the Executive order that restricts individuals from certain countries from entering the United States. This bill prohibits any federal agency funds, resources, or fees from being used to implement or enforce Executive Order 13769, entitled "Protecting the Nation from Foreign Terrorist Entry into the United States." Among the order's major provisions are restrictions on the entry of immigrants and nonimmigrants from seven countries (Iran, Iraq, Libya, Somalia, Sudan, Syria, and Yemen) and additional limitations on refugee admissions to the United States.
Title
A bill to block implementation of the Executive order that restricts individuals from certain countries from entering the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB722 (Related) 2017-02-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
HB724 (Related) 2017-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
HB735 (Related) 2017-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
SB549 (Related) 2017-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1075 (Related) 2017-03-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
SB1979 (Related) 2017-10-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB4271 (Related) 2017-12-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
HB724 (Related) 2017-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
HB735 (Related) 2017-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
SB549 (Related) 2017-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1075 (Related) 2017-03-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
SB1979 (Related) 2017-10-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB4271 (Related) 2017-12-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Subjects
Africa
Border security and unlawful immigration
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Iran
Iraq
Libya
Middle East
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Somalia
Sudan
Syria
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports
Yemen
Border security and unlawful immigration
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Iran
Iraq
Libya
Middle East
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Somalia
Sudan
Syria
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports
Yemen
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/248/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s248/BILLS-115s248is.pdf |