US HB4271 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To block the implementation of certain presidential actions that restrict individuals from certain countries from entering the United States. This bill prohibits any federal agency funds, resources, or fees from being used to implement or enforce Executive Order 13780 and the presidential proclamation of September 24, 2017. Among the order's major provisions are restrictions on the entry of nationals from Iran, Libya, Somalia, Sudan, Syria, and Yemen and additional limitations on refugee admissions to the United States. The proclamation revised such order to include entry restrictions on nationals from Chad, North Korea, and Venezuela, and remove such restrictions on nationals of Sudan. The proclamation additionally provides for enhanced U.S. vetting capacities.
Title
To block the implementation of certain presidential actions that restrict individuals from certain countries from entering the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2017-11-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security. |
2017-11-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Homeland Security, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Homeland Security, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Homeland Security, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Homeland Security, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB248 (Related) 2017-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB549 (Related) 2017-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1979 (Same As) 2017-10-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB549 (Related) 2017-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1979 (Same As) 2017-10-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Africa
Asia
Chad
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Iran
Latin America
Libya
Middle East
North Korea
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Somalia
Sudan
Syria
Travel and tourism
Venezuela
Visas and passports
Yemen
Asia
Chad
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Iran
Latin America
Libya
Middle East
North Korea
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Somalia
Sudan
Syria
Travel and tourism
Venezuela
Visas and passports
Yemen
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4271/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4271/BILLS-115hr4271ih.pdf |