US SB2422 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2016 Department of Veterans Affairs Seismic Safety and Construction Authorization Act (Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to carry out the following major medical facility projects (each with specified maximum authorized funds): seismic corrections to buildings, including retrofitting and replacement of high-risk buildings, in San Francisco, California; seismic corrections to facilities, including facilities to support homeless veterans, at the medical center in West Los Angeles, California; seismic corrections to the mental health and community living center in Long Beach, California; construction of an outpatient clinic, administrative space, cemetery, and columbarium in Alameda, California; realignment of medical facilities in Livermore, California; construction of a medical center in Louisville, Kentucky; construction of a replacement community living center in Perry Point, Maryland; and seismic corrections and other renovations to several buildings and construction of a specialty care building in American Lake, Washington. A specified amount is authorized to be appropriated to the VA for such projects for FY2016 or the year in which funds are appropriated for the Construction, Major Projects, account. Such projects may only be carried out using: funds appropriated for FY2016 pursuant to such authorization; funds available for Construction, Major Projects, for a fiscal year before, or a fiscal year after, FY2016 that remain available for obligation; funds appropriated for Construction, Major Projects, for FY2016 for a category of activity not specific to a project; and funds appropriated for Construction, Major Projects, for a fiscal year before, or a fiscal year after, FY2016 for a category of activity not specific to a project.
Title
Fiscal Year 2016 Department of Veterans Affairs Seismic Safety and Construction Authorization Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2016-01-25 | House | Received in the House. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S139) |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S139) |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S8885) |
Same As/Similar To
HB4334 (Related) 2016-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Building construction
California
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Kentucky
Mental health
Natural disasters
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Washington State
Building construction
California
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
Kentucky
Mental health
Natural disasters
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Veterans' medical care
Washington State