US SB2421 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-15)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Committee on Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Superfund, Waste Management, and Regulatory Oversight. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-237.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FARM Act Fair Agricultural Reporting Method Act This bill amends the Comprehensive Environmental Response, Compensation, and Liability Act of 1980 to exempt air emissions from animal waste at a farm from specified release notification requirements, recordkeeping requirements, and associated penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FARM Act Fair Agricultural Reporting Method Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Superfund, Waste Management, and Regulatory Oversight. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-237.
2018-02-13SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Same As/Similar To

HB1625 (Related) 2018-03-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-141.
HB5275 (Related) 2018-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback