US HB5275 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 75-18)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Agricultural Certainty for Reporting Emissions Act This bill amends the Comprehensive Environmental Response, Compensation, and Liability Act of 1980 to exempt air emissions from animal waste at a farm from specified release notification requirements, recordkeeping requirements, and associated penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agricultural Certainty for Reporting Emissions Act

Sponsors

Rep. Billy Long [R]Rep. Jim Costa [D]Rep. Michael Conaway [R]Rep. Walter Jones [R]
Rep. Scott Perry [R]Rep. Kevin Cramer [R]Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R]Rep. Ann Wagner [R]
Rep. Mike Bost [R]Rep. Andy Biggs [R]Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R]Rep. Liz Cheney [R]
Rep. David Young [R]Rep. Adrian Smith [R]Rep. Roger Marshall [R]Rep. Steve Womack [R]
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D]Rep. Ron Kind [D]Rep. Eric Crawford [R]Rep. Sam Graves [R]
Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R]Rep. David Valadao [R]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R]Rep. Thomas Rooney [R]
Rep. Pete Sessions [R]Rep. Stevan Pearce [R]Rep. Ralph Abraham [R]Rep. Gregg Harper [R]
Rep. Andy Harris [R]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D]Rep. David Rouzer [R]Rep. David McKinley [R]
Rep. Bill Shuster [R]Rep. Todd Rokita [R]Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R]Rep. Krysten Sinema [D]
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D]Rep. Jason Lewis [R]Rep. Tom Emmer [R]
Rep. Rob Bishop [R]Rep. Jason Smith [R]Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R]
Rep. Chris Collins [R]Rep. Mike Gallagher [R]Rep. Ken Buck [R]Rep. Sean Duffy [R]
Rep. Rod Blum [R]Rep. Steve King [R]Rep. John Ratcliffe [R]Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R]
Rep. David Kustoff [R]Rep. Joe Barton [R]Rep. Collin Peterson [D]Rep. Doug Collins [R]
Rep. Michael Simpson [R]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D]Rep. Kristi Noem [R]
Rep. Kevin Yoder [R]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D]Rep. Glenn Grothman [R]Rep. Steve Stivers [R]
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R]Rep. Warren Davidson [R]Rep. Bill Huizenga [R]Rep. Filemon Vela [D]
Rep. Claudia Tenney [R]Rep. Mac Thornberry [R]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D]Rep. Paul Mitchell [R]
Rep. Bruce Westerman [R]Rep. James Renacci [R]Rep. Ann Kuster [D]Rep. Martha Roby [R]
Rep. David Scott [D]Rep. Markwayne Mullin [R]Rep. John Garamendi [D]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D]
Rep. Bradley Byrne [R]Rep. Tom Marino [R]Rep. Jeff Denham [R]Rep. John Moolenaar [R]
Rep. Tim Walberg [R]Rep. Glenn Thompson [R]Rep. Bob Gibbs [R]Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R]
Rep. Terri Sewell [D]Rep. Greg Gianforte [R]Rep. Ted Yoho [R]Rep. Julia Brownley [D]
Rep. Jackie Walorski [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
2018-03-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2018-03-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-03-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2018-03-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2421 (Related) 2018-03-08 - Committee on Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Superfund, Waste Management, and Regulatory Oversight. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-237.
HB1625 (Related) 2018-03-23 - Became Public Law No: 115-141.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback