US SB240 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S699-700)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S699-700)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of the Treasury to establish a program to issue, upon the request of any individual, a number that may be used in connection with a Social Security number (or other identifying information) to assist in verifying the individual's identity. Within five years of the enactment of this bill, Treasury must ensure that the program is made available to any individual residing in the United States.
Title
Taxpayer Identity Protection Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S699-700) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1957 (Related) 2020-08-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-152. (TXT | PDF)
SB928 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2091)
HB3151 (Related) 2019-07-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-25. (TXT | PDF)
HR1053 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB928 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2091)
HB3151 (Related) 2019-07-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-25. (TXT | PDF)
HR1053 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/240/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s240/BILLS-116s240is.pdf |