US HB3151 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8)
Status: Enrolled on June 24 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Taxpayer First Act This bill revises requirements for the Internal Revenue Service (IRS) regarding its organizational structure, customer service, enforcement procedures, cybersecurity and identity protection, management of information technology, and use of electronic systems. The bill includes provisions that establish the IRS Independent Office of Appeals to resolve federal tax controversies without litigation; require the IRS to develop comprehensive customer service and IRS personnel training strategies; exempt certain low-income taxpayers from payments required to submit an offer-in-compromise; modify certain tax enforcement procedures and requirements; establish requirements for responding to Taxpayer Advocate Directives; establish a Community Volunteer Income Tax Assistance Matching Grant Program; require the IRS to give public notice of the closure of taxpayer assistance centers; modify procedures for whistle-blowers; establish requirements for cybersecurity and identity protection; provide notification to taxpayers of suspected identity theft; require the appointment of a Chief Information Officer who shall develop and implement a multiyear strategic plan for IRS information technology needs; modify requirements for managing IRS information technology; expand electronic filing of tax returns; prohibit the rehiring of certain IRS employees who were removed for misconduct; require mandatory e-filing by tax-exempt organizations and notice before revocation of tax-exempt status for failure to file; and increase penalties for failure to file tax returns. The bill also requires the IRS to implement an Internet platform for Form 1099 filings, a fully automated program for disclosing taxpayer information for third-party income verification using the Internet, and uniform standards and procedures for accepting electronic signatures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxpayer First Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24SenatePresented to President.
2019-06-13SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3626)
2019-06-11SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
2019-06-10HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-06-10HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4352-4362)
2019-06-10HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3151.
2019-06-10HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4352-4364)
2019-06-10HouseMr. Lewis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-06-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-06-06HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1219 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1825 (Related) 2019-03-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1875 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1957 (Related) 2019-04-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 75.
HB2007 (Related) 2019-04-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB240 (Related) 2019-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S699-700)
SB928 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2091)
SB1099 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1100 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Bank accounts, deposits, capital
Business records
Census and government statistics
Civil actions and liability
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Consumer credit
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Debt collection
Department of the Treasury
Employee hiring
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Income tax exclusion
Inflation and prices
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Internet and video services
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public contracts and procurement
Public-private cooperation
Right of privacy
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax-exempt organizations
Taxation
User charges and fees

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback