US SB2372 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on July 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 239.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 239.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of State and the President to make efforts to reduce marine debris. The State Department shall implement the U.S. policy to cooperate with foreign governments and the private sector to combat marine debris, which includes support for (1) strengthening systems for processing and reusing waste plastic, (2) developing and using reusable alternatives to disposable plastic products, and (3) deploying technology for capturing value from post-consumer materials and municipal solid waste streams. The President shall direct U.S. representatives to various international bodies to support U.S. marine debris policies. The Environmental Protection Agency is authorized to build partnerships in support such policies. The State Department shall report to Congress on the potential for entering into new agreements or creating a new forum to reduce land-based sources of marine debris and derelict fishing gear.
Title
Save Our Seas 2.0: Enhanced Global Engagement to Combat Marine Debris Act
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 239. |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-07-31 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3969 (Related) 2019-08-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
SB1982 (Related) 2020-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 116-224. (TXT | PDF)
SB1982 (Related) 2020-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 116-224. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Aquatic ecology
Consumer affairs
Economic development
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Foreign aid and international relief
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Multilateral development programs
Solid waste and recycling
Water quality
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Aquatic ecology
Consumer affairs
Economic development
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Foreign aid and international relief
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Multilateral development programs
Solid waste and recycling
Water quality
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection