US SB1982 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Save Our Seas 2.0 Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Save Our Seas 2.0 Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
2020-01-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2020-01-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
2020-01-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
2020-01-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-01-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-01-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-01-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-01-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-01-13HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-01-13HouseReceived in the House.
2020-01-13SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-01-09SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
2020-01-09SenateS.Amdt.1278 Amendment SA 1278 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2020-01-09SenateS.Amdt.1278 Amendment SA 1278 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Sullivan. (consideration: CR S148-149; text: CR S139-147) In the nature of a substitute.
2020-01-09SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S148-149)
2020-01-09SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2019-11-13SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-06-26SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HB3969 (Related) 2019-08-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
SB2364 (Related) 2019-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB2372 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 239.
SB2260 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 224.

Subjects

Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Aquatic ecology
Atmospheric science and weather
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Energy research
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Foreign aid and international relief
Forests, forestry, trees
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Intergovernmental relations
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Manufacturing
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Materials
Multilateral development programs
Performance measurement
Product development and innovation
Public-private cooperation
Roads and highways
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Solid waste and recycling
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Water quality
Water use and supply

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback